Esquenazi v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Benny Esquenazi
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv24715
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie I. R. Fidler on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Stephanie I. R. Fidler added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Fidler, Stephanie)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Eric Isicoff in the amount of $47.00 on 12/05/2019 re 7 Clerks Notice of Reimbursement of Overpayment of Filing Fee, (mua)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney General. (kpe)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Benny Esquenazi (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Isicoff, Eric)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Reimbursement of Overpayment of Filing Fee. The Clerk will refund $ 47.00, receipt #113C-12146402, re #1 PETITION (Complaint) for De Novo Review of Denial of Form N-400 Application for Naturalization, dated 11/14/2019. (jc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (kpe)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fees $400.00, receipt number 113C-12148327 re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (Isicoff, Eric)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The filing fee has not been paid (jao)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Insufficient filing fee paid. Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Amount $47.00, receipt #113C-12146402, case filed date: 11/14/2019. (jao)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (Complaint) for De Novo Review of Denial of Form N-400 Application for Naturalization RE: Government Agency (United States Citizenship and Immigration Services). Filing fee $ 47.00 receipt number 113C-12146402, filed by Benny Esquenazi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - Form N-400 Application, #4 Exhibit B - Denial of Form N-400 Application, #5 Exhibit C - Form N-336 Request, #6 Exhibit D - Denial of Form N-336 Request)(Isicoff, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esquenazi v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Stephanie I. R. Fidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Esquenazi
Represented By: Jordan Daniel Isicoff
Represented By: Christopher Michael Yannuzzi
Represented By: Tammy Jean Fox-Isicoff
Represented By: Eric David Isicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?