Diaz v. Inch
Plaintiff: Wilmen Diaz
Defendant: Mark Inch
Case Number: 1:2019cv24719
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Reset Deadlines Mark Inch answer due 2/5/2020 Per DE#11. (cqs)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer. Respondent shall file the answer on or before February 5, 2020. No further extensions shall be granted unless good cause shown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 1/7/2020. (jgg)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to petition for writ of habeas corpus re #6 Order to Show Cause,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. AND Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 by Mark Inch. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Polin, Richard) Modified Relief/Link on 1/6/2020 (ls).
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 12/20/2019 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS100200366. (vt)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard L. Polin on behalf of Mark Inch. Attorney Richard L. Polin added to party Mark Inch(pty:dft). (Polin, Richard)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this Petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 12/20/2019. Motions due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Not Paid/No IFP), filed by Wilmen Diaz.(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmen Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Richard L. Polin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?