Goldberg et al v. McAleenann et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Ramon Aragones Pardo, Linh Thi Thuy Pham, Michael I. Goldberg, Elena Astakhova, Alvaro Victor Alejandr Garcia, Paulo Guntovitch Krieger, Lan Hoang Nguyen, Ling Tang, Meihang Lu, Parviz Abdeveis, Qing He, HRH Linus Nto Mbah, Mauricio Esteban Garci Giraldo and Alvaro Victor Alejandro Lorenzo Sousa Garcia
Defendant: Kevin McAleenann, Kenneth T (Ken) Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Sarah Kendall, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chief, Immigrant Investor Program Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security and Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv24753
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Diaz on behalf of Chief, Immigrant Investor Program Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Chief, Immigrant Investor Program Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Diaz, Natalie)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mauricio Esteban Garci Giraldo, Linh Thi Thuy Pham, Elena Astakhova, Meihang Lu, Rafael Ramon Aragones Pardo, Ling Tang, Parviz Abdeveis, Qing He, Alvaro Victor Alejandro Lorenzo Sousa Garcia, Lan Hoang Nguyen, HRH Linus Nto Mbah, Paulo Guntovitch Krieger.(Surgeon, Naim)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Daniel B. Lundy and H. Ronald Klasko, mailing date November 18, 2019, (cco)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (ebz) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (ebz).
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ in the Nature of Mandamus against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12153990, filed by Mauricio Esteban Garci Giraldo, Linh Thi Thuy Pham, Elena Astakhova, Michael I. Goldberg, Meihang Lu, Rafael Ramon Aragones Pardo, Ling Tang, Parviz Abdeveis, Qing He, Alvaro Victor Alejandr Garcia, Lan Hoang Nguyen, HRH Linus Nto Mbah, Paulo Guntovitch Krieger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Surgeon, Naim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldberg et al v. McAleenann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ramon Aragones Pardo
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linh Thi Thuy Pham
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael I. Goldberg
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Astakhova
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Victor Alejandr Garcia
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulo Guntovitch Krieger
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lan Hoang Nguyen
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ling Tang
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meihang Lu
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parviz Abdeveis
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qing He
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HRH Linus Nto Mbah
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Esteban Garci Giraldo
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Victor Alejandro Lorenzo Sousa Garcia
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T (Ken) Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief, Immigrant Investor Program Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?