Longhini v. Previti
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Defendant: Peter Previti, as Trustee for Sunset Business Plaza Trust and Peter Previti
Case Number: 1:2019cv24787
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of Referral to Mediation and Directing Plaintiff's Counsel to Submit (Within Fourteen Days) Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation. Mediation Deadline 7/27/2020. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 01/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (dp)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Adopting Joint Scheduling Report, Setting Pretrial Conference and Trial, Establishing Pretrial Deadlines, and Establishing Pretrial and Trial Procedures: Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 09:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Joan A. Lenard. Calendar Call set for 1/27/2021 04:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pretrial Conference set for 12/28/2020 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Joan A. Lenard. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 01/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order of Reference of Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 01/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Doug Longhini (Attachments: #1 Supplement Joint Scheduling Form, #2 Supplement Election to Jurisdiction by Magistrate for Final Disposition of Motions, #3 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Perez, Anthony)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #5 Answer to Complaint Joint Stipulation as to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Initial Mediation before Anthony Torrente Initial Mediation Deadline 2/21/2020. Initial Mediation Hearing set for 2/19/2020 11:00 AM Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 1/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Doug Longhini Notice of Filing Order Scheduling Initial Mediation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Scheduling Initial Mediation) (Perez, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doug Longhini identifying Other Affiliate Charles D. Childers for Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #6 Order Verified Certificate of Plaintiff's Counsel Regarding Prior Filings Under the Americans with Disabilities Act for the Subject Properties and Defendants by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions per DE #7 . (vjk)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Forth the Court's Policy on Motions for Extension or Stay of the Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/18/19. See attached document for full details. (dp)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Referral to Initial Mediation and Directing Plaintiff's Counsel to Submit (Within Fourteen Days) Proposed Order Scheduling Initial Mediation. Mediation Deadline 2/21/2020. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/18/19. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (dp)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Referring Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan; Directing Parties to File Certificates of Interested Parties; Directing Parties to File a Notice of Refiling And/or of Related Cases; Requiring Completion of Form Consenting to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge; and Requiring Completion of Joint Scheduling Report and Form. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/18/19. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix) (dp)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Certificate of Counsel Regarding Any Prior Filings under the Americans with Disabilities Act. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/18/19. See attached document for full details. (dp)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Peter Previti. Attorney Evan Andrew Zuckerman added to party Peter Previti(pty:dft). (Zuckerman, Evan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Doug Longhini. Peter Previti served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Peter Previti. (mee)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter Previti, as Trustee for Sunset Business Plaza Trust. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12162460, filed by Doug Longhini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longhini v. Previti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Previti, as Trustee for Sunset Business Plaza Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Previti
Represented By: Evan Andrew Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?