Pham v. Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Tram T. Pham
Defendant: Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv24798
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Civil Case Terminated, per #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Closing Case. (ps1)
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tram T. Pham (Shadle, Leah)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (tb)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Calendar Call set for 6/16/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Bench Trial set for 6/22/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. ), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Spaccarotella, John)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Tram T. Pham (Shadle, Leah)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services identifying Other Affiliate John C. Spaccarotella, Other Affiliate Ariana Fajardo Orshan, Other Affiliate William P. Barr for Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Spaccarotella, John)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 12/30/2019 Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C. Spaccarotella on behalf of Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Spaccarotella, John)
December 10, 2019 Case Reopened (ps1)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk of the Court is directed to REOPEN the case. Plaintiff has until February 20, 2020 to serve Defendant with the summons and Complaint. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order Dismissing Case, by Tram T. Pham. (Shadle, Leah)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff, Tram T. Pham's Complaint for Mandamus [ECF No. 1] is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (pcs)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus against Kenneth T Cuccinelli. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12163839, filed by Tram Thi Pham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Shadle, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pham v. Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: John C. Spaccarotella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tram T. Pham
Represented By: Leah Teresa Shadle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?