Marine Depot International, Inc. v. James River Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marine Depot International, Inc.
Defendant: James River Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv24821
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
2 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against James River Group, Inc., filed by Marine Depot International, Inc..(Ferot, Alice)
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Marine Depot International, Inc. (Ferot, Alice)
January 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadline as to #12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #9 Notice of Compliance,, . Responses due by 1/17/2020. SEE DE 15 ORDER (ail)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion for extension #14 . Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion to dismiss on or before January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/7/2020. (clu)
January 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #9 Notice of Compliance,, by Marine Depot International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferot, Alice)
January 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alice Ferot on behalf of Marine Depot International, Inc.. Attorney Alice Ferot added to party Marine Depot International, Inc. (pty:pla). (Ferot, Alice)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #9 Notice of Compliance,, by James River Group, Inc.. Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Thomas E. Peach)(Lever, Daniel)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 1/26/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by James River Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Exh. A)(Lever, Daniel)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance -Notice of Filing Copies of All Records and Proceedings in Underlying Case by James River Group, Inc. re #7 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Docket Report), #2 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 -Summons, #6 Exhibit 5 - ESummons, #7 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Appearance - Ferot, #8 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Appearance - Gutchess, #9 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Appearance - Shore, #10 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service, #11 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Lever, Daniel)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by James River Group, Inc. (Lever, Daniel)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge James Lawrence King recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document James River Group, Inc.. Answer due 12/28/2019. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by James River Group, Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ch1)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint ) by James River Group, Inc.. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lever, Daniel) Modified Relief/Link on 11/25/2019 (ls).
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12167708, filed by James River Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C")(Lever, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marine Depot International, Inc. v. James River Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Group, Inc.
Represented By: Barry L. Davis
Represented By: Daniel R. Lever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Depot International, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Shore
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Represented By: Alice Ferot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?