Mahl v. Mahl
Appellee: Charles Mahl
Appellant: Louanne Mahl
Case Number: 1:2019cv24824
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Appellant's Agreed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. This case shall be dismissed. The parties shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Louanne Mahl. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 1/8/2020. (jc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on October 2, 2019 before Judge Laurel M. Iscoff, Volume Number 1, 1-39 pages, Court Reporter: OUELLETTE & MAULDIN COURT REPORTERS, INC. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2020. (lle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Louanne Mahl (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 APPELLANT DESIGNATIONS, #3 DESIGNATED ITEMS)(lle)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Louanne Mahl (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 19-17245-LMI, filed by Louanne Mahl.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahl v. Mahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Charles Mahl
Represented By: Paul L. Orshan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Louanne Mahl
Represented By: Grace E. Robson
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?