MCARTHUR v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Plaintiff: ELLIOTT MCARTHUR
Defendant: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 1:2019cv24858
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS of Filing State Trial Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Transcripts 7-26-1996 Plea Hearing Transcript) (Zack, Brian)
December 26, 2019 Filing 17 APPENDIX by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Zack, Brian)
December 26, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Zack, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Zack, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Hernan Zack on behalf of SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. Attorney Brian Hernan Zack added to party SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS(pty:dft). (Zack, Brian)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO RESPONDENT. Respondent shall file the written notice in accordance with the Courts Order to Show Cause immediately, but at the very least no later than 9:00 AM on Monday, December 9, 2019. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this Petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00487. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida and close the file in this Court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/22/2019. (sdw)
November 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #7 Prisoner Consent Form & Financial Certificate. (sdw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sdw)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF Doc. #2 , is deferred for ruling. The clerk shall forward to Petitioner the prisoner consent form portion of the form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Petitioner shall submit payment in the amount of $5.00, or submit an executed and completed prisoner consent form. Fee/Consent Form due by 11/22/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/23/2019. (form to Pet) (sdw)
October 21, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR. (sdw) Modified on 10/23/2019 to terminate motion (sdw).
October 7, 2019 Set Deadlines re #4 Order. Financial Consent form/Filing Fee due by 10/21/2019. (sdw)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall forward to Petitioner the prisoner consent form portion of the form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, Petitioner shall submit payment in the amount of $5.00, or submit an executed and completed prisoner consent form. After the expiration of fourteen (14) days, the Court will consider the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Doc. #2 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/7/2019. (form to Pet) (sdw)
October 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se litigant ELLIOTT MCARTHUR. (sdw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR. (sdw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR. (no service copies) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCARTHUR v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Brian Hernan Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLIOTT MCARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?