Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Hoover Lopez, Berta Montalvo, Julio Rodriguez, Unknown Tenant No.1, Unknown Tenant No.2 and All Unknown Parties Claiming Interests By, Through, Under or Against a Named Defendant to this Action, or Having or Claiming to Have Any Right, Title or Interest In the Property Herein Described
Case Number: 1:2019cv24882
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Granting Motion to Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: 17-000292-CA-11 (kpe)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order granting #9 Motion to Remand. This case is Remanded to the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in Miami-Dade County, Florida. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Motion #15 referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 30, 2019 Filing 17 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Rosenn, Jonathan)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Rosenn, Jonathan)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Rosenn, Jonathan)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #6 Plaintiff Deutsche Bank's Motion to Remand, to Enforce Settlement Agreement, to Sanction Attorney Julio C. Marrero, and for Reasonable Fees and Costs. An #9 Amended Motion to Remand as been filed. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/26/2019. (kml)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/6/2020 Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the parties' #11 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Joint Conference Report and to Dispense with In-Person Conference Requirement. Given that the relief requested in the parties' motion would inadvertently require them to file the report before their deadline, the parties shall file a report on or before January 6, 2020. The parties may conduct the meeting telephonically. All other deadlines shall remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/20/2019. (kml)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint conference report and to dispense with requirement of in-person meeting re #7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Responses due by 1/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenn, Jonathan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank National Trust Company for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Rosenn, Jonathan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Rosenn, Jonathan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court , To Enforce Settlement Agreement, To Sanction Attorney Julio C. Marrero Pursuant to Court's Inherent Power, and For Reasonable Fees and Costs by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Rosenn, Jonathan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Berta Montalvo re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Filing Pleadings to Accompany Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Marrero, Julio)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (kpe)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (kpe)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12178774, filed by Felix Montalvo as Personal Representative of the Defendant Estate of Berta Montalvo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marrero, Julio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoover Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berta Montalvo
Represented By: Julio Cesar Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant No.1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant No.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Unknown Parties Claiming Interests By, Through, Under or Against a Named Defendant to this Action, or Having or Claiming to Have Any Right, Title or Interest In the Property Herein Described
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Jonathan R. Rosenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?