Longhini v. Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Defendant: Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc and Mi Lindo Ecuador, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv24923
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The Stipulation, DE#24 , is APPROVED filed by Doug Longhini. Affirmative Defense Numbers 3, 4, 7, 9, 11, 14, 15, and 16 of Defendants Answer, DE#16 , are WITHDRAWN. Defendant is granted leave to amend Affirmative Defense Numbers 2, 6, 8, 12, and 13 by no later than February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
January 23, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #16 Answer to Complaint Joint Stipulation as to Defendant Mi Lindo Ecuador's Affirmative Defenses by Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before ROBERT DULBERG: Mediation Hearing set for 4/28/2020 10:30 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
January 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Robert Dulberg as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/28/2020 at 10:30 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Scheduling Mediation)(Perez, Anthony)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #20 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Defendant Mi Lindo Ecuador's Affirmative Defenses. Plaintiff shall have until January 24, 2020, to file any such motion. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom. (ks01)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses as to Defendant Mi Lindo Ecuador re #16 Answer to Complaint by Doug Longhini. Responses due by 1/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perez, Anthony)
January 14, 2020 Filing 19 Westend @ 25th Condominium Association Inc's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Doug Longhini by Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc. (Sweetbaum, Ari)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020., Discovery due by 6/2/2020., Expert Discovery due by 6/2/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2020., Mediation Deadline 6/16/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/24/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2020., Motions due by 6/24/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/14/2020., Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/22/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 30, 2019 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Doug Longhini (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Scheduling Form, #2 Exhibit Election to Jurisdiction by Magistrate, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Perez, Anthony)
December 26, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Mi Lindo Ecuador, Inc.. (Kay, Jordan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan Charles Kay on behalf of Mi Lindo Ecuador, Inc.. Attorney Jordan Charles Kay added to party Mi Lindo Ecuador, Inc.(pty:dft). (Kay, Jordan)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc. by 1/14/2020. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Doug Longhini. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc. (Sweetbaum, Ari)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ari A. Sweetbaum on behalf of Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc. Attorney Ari A. Sweetbaum added to party Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc(pty:dft). (Sweetbaum, Ari)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Doug Longhini. Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Doug Longhini. Mi Lindo Ecuador, Inc. served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #4 Order into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Gilberto Castro Sr.. (Perez, Anthony)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Parties Not Added, Gilberto Castro Sr.. ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (jas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Verified Certificate of Plaintiff's Counsel Regarding Prior Filings Under the Americans with Disabilities Act for the Subject Properties and Defendants by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doug Longhini identifying Other Affiliate Berbardo Alonso, Other Affiliate Barbara Eljaua, Other Affiliate Robert Meneses, Other Affiliate Anthony De Rosa, Other Affiliate Octavio G. Castro Robalino, Other Affiliate Octavio Castro Carriel, Other Affiliate Charles D. Childers, Other Affiliate Ray Fernandez for Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, SCHEDULING REPORT, AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mi Lindo Ecuador, Inc., Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mi Lindo Ecuador, Inc., Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12185601, filed by Doug Longhini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons as to Westend, #3 Summon(s) Summons as to Mi Lindo Ecuador)(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longhini v. Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westend @ 25th Condominium Association, Inc
Represented By: Ari A. Sweetbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi Lindo Ecuador, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Charles Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?