Harris v. Secretary, Department of Corrections, et al.
Plaintiff: Gregory Harris
Respondent: Secretary Department of Corrections and Attorney General, State of Florida
Case Number: 1:2019cv24989
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-01375. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 12/3/2019. (CAW)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSFER IN from the District of Columbia. Case assigned to District Judge Adams and Magistrate Judge Toomey. New Case Number: 3:19-cv-1375-J-25JBT. (MAA)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-03158. File received electronically
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Middle District of Florida. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 11/20/2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/31/19. (zmd) [Transferred from dcd on 11/26/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by GREGORY HARRIS (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 11/26/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GREGORY HARRIS (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 11/26/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by GREGORY HARRIS. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 11/26/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/15/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 11/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Secretary, Department of Corrections, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?