Fenelus v. Citrus Family Care Network of Miami Dade and Monroe County
Plaintiff: Djino Fenelus
Defendant: Citrus Family Care Network of Miami Dade and Monroe County
Case Number: 1:2019cv25064
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Djino Fenelus. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (kml)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Consumer/Statement of Guardianship Form/U.S. Dept. Education Complaint by Djino Fenelus (drz)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Djino Fenelus. (jas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citrus Family Care Network of Miami Dade and Monroe County. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Djino Fenelus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fenelus v. Citrus Family Care Network of Miami Dade and Monroe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Djino Fenelus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrus Family Care Network of Miami Dade and Monroe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?