Obeng v. Delta Dental Plans Association et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Stephen N Obeng
Defendant: Delta Dental of Wisconsin, Delta Dental Plans Association, Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc., Delta Dental of the District of Columbia, Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma, Delta Dental of Colorado, Hawaii Dental Service, Delta Dental of Nebraska, Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc., Delta Dental of Virginia, Delta Dental of New York, Inc., DeltaUSA, Delta Dental of California, Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Pennsylvania, Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc., Delta Dental of Iowa, Delta Dental of Illinois, Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental Insurance Company, Delta Dental of Missouri, Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc., Delta Dental of Rhode Island, Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc., Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc., Oregon Dental Service, Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental of Minnesota, Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc., Delta Dental of South Dakota, Delta Dental of Washington, Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming, Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc., Maine Dental Service Corp., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc. and Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv25072
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the contact information for PHV attorney Kathy L. Osborn re #58 Notice of Change of Address. (pt)
February 5, 2020 Filing 59 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Jaime Abigail Quick re #58 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick is directed to update their information via the attorneys PACER account, Manage My Account. Pursuant to CM/ECF NextGen procedures, all updates to an attorneys contact information and primary email address must be made through the attorneys PACER account. (pt)
February 5, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jaime Abigail Quick (Quick, Jaime)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Stay. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 31, 2020 Filing 56 STIPULATION re #54 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Ruling from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Pending Motion for Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Kathy L. Osborn. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/21/2020. (pb00)
January 17, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Ruling from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Pending Motion for Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 by Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc., Delta Dental Insurance Company, Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma, Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming, Delta Dental Plans Association, Delta Dental of California, Delta Dental of Colorado, Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc., Delta Dental of Illinois, Delta Dental of Iowa, Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc., Delta Dental of Minnesota, Delta Dental of Missouri, Delta Dental of Nebraska, Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc., Delta Dental of New York, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Pennsylvania, Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc., Delta Dental of Rhode Island, Delta Dental of South Dakota, Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc., Delta Dental of Virginia, Delta Dental of Washington, Delta Dental of Wisconsin, Delta Dental of the District of Columbia, DeltaUSA, Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc., Hawaii Dental Service, Maine Dental Service Corp., Oregon Dental Service. Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plans Association(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of California(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Illinois(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Iowa(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Minnesota(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Missouri(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Nebraska(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of New York, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Pennsylvania(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Rhode Island(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of South Dakota(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Virginia(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Washington(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Wisconsin(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of the District of Columbia(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party DeltaUSA(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Hawaii Dental Service(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Maine Dental Service Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Oregon Dental Service(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1 - Initial Case Management Order, dkt. 95, #3 Exhibit 2 - Consolidated Amended Complaint, dkt. 96, #4 Exhibit 3 - JPML Motion to Transfer, dkt. 1, #5 Exhibit 4 - - Defendants response to JPML motion, #6 Exhibit 5 - Order Re Defendants_ Motion to Stay Proceedings, #7 Exhibit 6 - Schwartz order regarding stay, #8 Exhibit 7 - Email from B Miller to M. Zappala, #9 Exhibit 8 - Braunstein, #10 Exhibit 9 - Lutins & Benitez stipulation, #11 Exhibit 10 - email chain re Obeng stip)(Quick, Jaime)
January 17, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kathy L. Osborn. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C- 113C-12318786. Filing Fee $ 75.00 by Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.. Responses due by 1/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quick, Jaime)
January 17, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Abigail Quick on behalf of Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.. Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of North Carolina(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime Abigail Quick added to party Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.(pty:dft). (Quick, Jaime)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar)
January 2, 2020 Filing 50 STIPULATION by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 1/31/2020, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 19, 2019 Filing 48 Courtesy Copy of Motion for Transfer of Related Actions to the Northern District of Illinois for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 sent to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service)(mc)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Charles J. Cooper and Harold S. Reeves. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 10, 2019 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc., Delta Dental Insurance Company, Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma, Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc., Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming, Delta Dental Plans Association, Delta Dental of California, Delta Dental of Colorado, Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc., Delta Dental of Illinois, Delta Dental of Iowa, Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc., Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc., Delta Dental of Minnesota, Delta Dental of Missouri, Delta Dental of Nebraska, Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc., Delta Dental of New York, Inc., Delta Dental of North Carolina, Delta Dental of Pennsylvania, Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc., Delta Dental of Rhode Island, Delta Dental of South Dakota, Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc., Delta Dental of Virginia, Delta Dental of Washington, Delta Dental of Wisconsin, Delta Dental of the District of Columbia, DeltaUSA, Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc., Hawaii Dental Service, Maine Dental Service Corp., Oregon Dental Service. (kpe)
December 10, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of Wisconsin by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of Washington by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of Virginia by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of South Dakota by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Rhode Island by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of Pennsylvania by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Oregon Dental Service by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of North Carolina by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of New York, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Nebraska by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of Missouri by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of Minnesota by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Maine Dental Service Corp. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Delta Dental of Iowa by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Delta Dental of Illinois by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/13/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Hawaii Dental Service by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Delta Dental of the District of Columbia by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Delta Dental of Colorado by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental of California by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc. by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Insurance Company by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for DeltaUSA by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Delta Dental Plans Association by Stephen N Obeng (Cooper, Paul)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Charles J. Cooper, Harold S. Reeves. Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 113C-12213304 by Stephen N Obeng. Responses due by 12/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Paul)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12211657, filed by Stephen N Obeng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obeng v. Delta Dental Plans Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Wisconsin
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plans Association
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of West Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of the District of Columbia
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Oklahoma
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Colorado
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Dental Service
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Nebraska
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of New Hampshire, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Idaho, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Virginia
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeltaUSA
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of California
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Vermont, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of North Carolina
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Dental Insurance Service, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Iowa
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Illinois
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Insurance Company
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Missouri
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Service of Massachusetts, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Rhode Island
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Dental Service
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of New Mexico, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Minnesota
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of New Jersey, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of South Dakota
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Washington
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Wyoming
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Indiana, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental Plan of Arkansas, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maine Dental Service Corp.
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dental of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Represented By: Jaime Abigail Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Stephen N Obeng
Represented By: Paul Davis Cooper
Represented By: Harold S. Reeves
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?