UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $67,040.00 in United States Currency Seized from a Shopping Bag and Backpack
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $67,040.00 in United States Currency Seized from a Shopping Bag and Backpack
Case Number: 1:2019mc21368
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Complaint. Plaintiff has until June 3, 2019 to file a complaint or submit appropriate settlement documents or to take other further action as necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/17/2019. (km03)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Enlargement of Time to File Civil Complaint or Take Other Action re 3 Order, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 5/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehr, Alison)
April 11, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. per DE #4 Order Closing Case. (mr1)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1 Agreed Motion to Enlarge Time In Which To File Complaint. Plaintiff has until May 24, 2019 to file a complaint or submit appropriate settlement documents or to take other further action as necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/11/2019. (km03)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Unassigned and Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. (vmz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Agreed Motion (Complaint) to Extend Time to File CAFRA Case . Filing fee $ 47.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (check box), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehr, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $67,040.00 in United States Currency Seized from a Shopping Bag and Backpack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $67,040.00 in United States Currency Seized from a Shopping Bag and Backpack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Alison Whitney Lehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?