MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Preferred Insurance Company, 21st Century North America Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers New Century Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance of Columbus, Inc., 21st Century Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Foremost Signature Insurance Company and Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Respondent: Health Care Advisors Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019mc23104
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,,, by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, 21st Century North America Insurance Company, 21st Century Preferred Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Insurance of Columbus, Inc., Farmers New Century Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - M.D. Fla. Order) (Gerstin, Ari)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to #9 Response/Reply (Other), in Support of Motion to Compel by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, 21st Century North America Insurance Company, 21st Century Preferred Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Insurance of Columbus, Inc., Farmers New Century Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - meet and confer communications)(Gerstin, Ari)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,,, by Health Care Advisors Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Dated July 17, 2019, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of David Salazar)(Rhodes, William)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Health Care Advisors Services, Inc. has until August 19, 2019 to file its response in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/16/2019. (km03)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,,, by Health Care Advisors Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhodes, William)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL HEALTH CARE ADVISORS SERVICES, INC. TO COMPLY WITH SUBPEONA FOR DOCUMENTS IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHNATHAN GOODMAN. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, 21st Century North America Insurance Company, 21st Century Preferred Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Insurance of Columbus, Inc., Farmers New Century Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Fire Insurance Exchange, Other Affiliate Truck Insurance Exchange for 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, 21st Century North America Insurance Company, 21st Century Preferred Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Illinois Farmers Insurance Company for Farmers New Century Insurance Company (Gerstin, Ari)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, 21st Century Insurance Company, 21st Century North America Insurance Company, 21st Century Preferred Insurance Company, Coast National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Insurance of Columbus, Inc., Farmers New Century Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gerstin, Ari)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (cds)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District Issued to Health Care Advisors Services, Inc.. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-11846780, filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, Foremost Signature Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance of Columbus, Inc., Mid-Century Insurance Company, 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Coast National Insurance Company, 21st Century North America Insurance Company, Farmers New Century Insurance Company, 21st Century Preferred Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, 21st Century Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit 2- Operative Complaint in the California Action, #3 Exhibit 3 - Initial Objections to Subpoena, #4 Exhibit 4 - May 1, 2019 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Revised Objections to Subpoena)(Gerstin, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Charles Edward Whorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: Charles Edward Whorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century North America Insurance Company
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast National Insurance Company
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers New Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance of Columbus, Inc.
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Signature Insurance Company
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: Ari Gerstin
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Pertnoy
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Health Care Advisors Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Frederick Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?