In re: 1973 Cessna 172 M
Plaintiff: United States of America
In Re: 1973 CESSNA
Case Number: 1:2019mc24625
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Complaint, or submission of appropriate settlement documents or to take such further action as may be necessary with respect to Defendants, Deadline 1/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (cg1)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time through & including January 6, 2020 re #4 Order, by United States of America. Responses due by 12/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehr, Alison)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Extend Time to File CAFRA Case, filed by United States of America. Plaintiff will have through and including December 5, 2019, in which to file a complaint or submit appropriate settlement documents or to take such further action as may be necessary. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 11/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (jc)
November 14, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (jc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Complaint Cover Sheet by United States Attorney (jc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (vjk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 Motion (Complaint) to Extend Time to File CAFRA Case. Filing fee $ 47.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Complaint Cover Sheet, #3 Order)(vjk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/14/2019) (jc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: 1973 Cessna 172 M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: 1973 CESSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alison Whitney Lehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?