MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, GILEAD SCIENCES, LLC, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC., JANSSEN R&D IRELAND, JAPAN TOBACCO INTERNATIONAL USA, INC., GILEAD SCIENCES IRELAND UC, AKROS PHARMA, INC., JAPAN TOBACCO, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC and E. R. SQUIBB & SONS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv20170
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
2 Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0002
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-00737, filed 01/31/2020. (bb)
January 30, 2020 Filing 24 Clerks Notice to Filer re #17 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#23]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
January 29, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. See image at DE #17 (lk)
January 29, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:20-cv-20170 electronically transferred out to California Northern. (ar2)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Transfer; Granting in part and Denying in part #12 Motion for an Extension of Time. The Clerk shall close this matter and take all necessary steps to ensure the prompt transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 29, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. JAPAN TOBACCO INTERNATIONAL USA, INC. served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
January 29, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. GILEAD SCIENCES, LLC served on 1/18/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
January 29, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. served on 1/18/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. E. R. SQUIBB & SONS, LLC served on 1/18/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY served on 1/18/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAPAN TOBACCO INTERNATIONAL USA, INC. (Hoffman, Jerome)
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerome Wayne Hoffman on behalf of JAPAN TOBACCO INTERNATIONAL USA, INC.. Attorney Jerome Wayne Hoffman added to party JAPAN TOBACCO INTERNATIONAL USA, INC.(pty:dft). (Hoffman, Jerome)
January 28, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, E. R. SQUIBB & SONS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent None, Other Affiliate E.R. Squibb & Sons, LLC for BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (Ross, Jason)
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason A Ross on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, E. R. SQUIBB & SONS, LLC. Attorney Jason A Ross added to party BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney Jason A Ross added to party E. R. SQUIBB & SONS, LLC(pty:dft). (Ross, Jason)
January 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, /Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Martin, Moneyede)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Martin, Moneyede)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Martin, Moneyede)
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue /Defendants' Consent Motion for Transfer by GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. Responses due by 2/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Moneyede)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Moneyede Martin on behalf of GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. Attorney Moneyede Martin added to party GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Moneyede Martin added to party GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.(pty:dft). (Martin, Moneyede)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Nelson Zakia on behalf of GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. Attorney Jason Nelson Zakia added to party GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Nelson Zakia added to party GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.(pty:dft). (Zakia, Jason)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge James Lawrence King recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 1/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AKROS PHARMA, INC., BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, E. R. SQUIBB & SONS, LLC, GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC, GILEAD SCIENCES IRELAND UC, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC., GILEAD SCIENCES, LLC, JANSSEN R&D IRELAND, JAPAN TOBACCO INTERNATIONAL USA, INC., JAPAN TOBACCO, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (ar2)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12307821, filed by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, a Delaware series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s))(Rivero, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: Jason A Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILEAD SCIENCES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Represented By: Jason Nelson Zakia
Represented By: Moneyede Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN R&D IRELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAPAN TOBACCO INTERNATIONAL USA, INC.
Represented By: Jerome Wayne Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILEAD SCIENCES IRELAND UC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKROS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAPAN TOBACCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILEAD HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jason Nelson Zakia
Represented By: Moneyede Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. R. SQUIBB & SONS, LLC
Represented By: Jason A Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Andres Rivero
Represented By: Jorge Alejandro Mestre
Represented By: Charles Edward Whorton
Represented By: Alan H. Rolnick
Represented By: David Lee DaPonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?