Norris v. Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Mr. Bernard B. Norris
Defendant: Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv20179
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security, filed by Bernard B. Norris.(Sharp, Christopher)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Bernard B. Norris. Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security served on 1/24/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Sharp, Christopher)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noticing INS Attorney on behalf of Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security (asl)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security (cds)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against Homeland Security Secretary. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12308939, filed by Bernard B. Norris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sharp, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris v. Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Bernard B. Norris
Represented By: Christopher Charles Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?