MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC v. BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability and SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II LLC,
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANTARUS, INC. and SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20555
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-01587, filed 03/04/2020. (bb)
February 28, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:20-cv-20555 electronically transferred out to California Northern. (wc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. SANTARUS, INC. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
February 26, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
February 26, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
February 26, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
February 26, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS INC. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
February 18, 2020 Civil Case Terminated, per #17 Order directing the Clerk to TRANSFER the case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Closing Case. (ps1)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Change Venue; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. The Clerk shall TRANSFER the case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, and mark this case closed in this District. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 17, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Inc. for LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.; Other Affiliate Lupin Inc. for LUPIN LTD. (Rosman, Mark)
February 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Robert Rosman on behalf of LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Attorney Mark Robert Rosman added to party LUPIN LTD.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Robert Rosman added to party LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.(pty:dft). (Rosman, Mark)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, /Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANTARUS, INC.. (Ross, Jason)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANTARUS, INC. (Ross, Jason)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue /Defendants' Consent Motion for Transfer by BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANTARUS, INC.. Responses due by 2/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. Ross, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Ross, Jason)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANTARUS, INC. (Ross, Jason)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason A Ross on behalf of BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANTARUS, INC.. Attorney Jason A Ross added to party BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason A Ross added to party SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason A Ross added to party SANTARUS, INC.(pty:dft). (Ross, Jason)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS INC. identifying Corporate Parent no corporate parent for ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS INC. (Bahadue, Suria)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Suria Marie Bahadue on behalf of ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS INC.. Attorney Suria Marie Bahadue added to party ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS INC.(pty:dft). (Bahadue, Suria)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rivero, Andres)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the parties shall file their agreed motion to transfer venue by February 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Telephone Conference held on 2/12/2020. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Charles Edward Whorton, Brendan Kaufman, Jason Ross, Daniel Asimow, Victoria Weatherford. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mc00)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephone Status Conference re Service on Foreign Defendants set for 2/12/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (wc)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS INC., BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., SANTARUS, INC.. (jao)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12413059, filed by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s), #13 Summon(s))(Rivero, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC v. BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC.
Represented By: Jason A Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSERTIO THERAPEUTICS INC.
Represented By: Suria Marie Bahadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LTD.
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTARUS, INC.
Represented By: Jason A Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Jason A Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC
Represented By: Andres Rivero
Represented By: Charles Edward Whorton
Represented By: Jorge Alejandro Mestre
Represented By: David Lee DaPonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability
Represented By: Andres Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II LLC,
Represented By: Andres Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?