DE LA CRUZ et al v. SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ANDRES DE LA CRUZ and MONICA DE LA CRUZ
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP TRUST 2006-HE5 and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20562
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction for Trial by ANDRES DE LA CRUZ, MONICA DE LA CRUZ (jc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Election to Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge for Final Disposition of Motions by ANDRES DE LA CRUZ, MONICA DE LA CRUZ (jc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) ANDRES DE LA CRUZ to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: NO EMAIL ADDRESS PROVIDED by ANDRES DE LA CRUZ (jc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) MONICA DE LA CRUZ to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: NO EMAIL ADDRESS PROVIDED by MONICA DE LA CRUZ (jc)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 3/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (aw)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2020., Discovery due by 10/20/2020., Expert Discovery due by 10/20/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 5/11/2020., Mediation Deadline 11/3/2020., In Limine Motions due by 11/12/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2020., Motions due by 11/12/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/1/2021., Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 2/9/2021 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.)( Mediation Deadline 11/3/2020.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (proposed dates), #2 Exhibit B (order), #3 Exhibit C (election))(Oakes, Courtney)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #9 ORDER Requiring Response to #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)..( Responses due by 3/16/2020). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) (ls)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Requiring Response to #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)..( Responses due by 3/16/2020). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/11/2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Oakes, Courtney)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 3/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage)(Oakes, Courtney)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. #4 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, ECF No. [1-1], by February 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom. (ks01)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, to Respond to Complaint by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Oakes, Courtney)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES, ( Motions due by 3/9/2020.) Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - for Detrimental Reliance, Fraud in the Concealment, Fraud in the Inducement, Unconscionable Contracts, Breach of Contract, Breach of Contract, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Quiet Title, Slander of Title (Regulation X, 12 CRF 1024.42)) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12414084, filed by U.S. BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP TRUST 2006-HE5, SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court filings, #3 Exhibit 3- State Court docket, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oakes, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DE LA CRUZ et al v. SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Courtney Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP TRUST 2006-HE5
Represented By: Courtney Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Courtney Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRES DE LA CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONICA DE LA CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?