Lemieux v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terri Lemieux
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20591
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #18 Defendant Celebrity Cruises, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Defendant shall have until and including April 17, 2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 4/9/2020. (gie)
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses and to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Applin, Nicholas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Terri Lemieux (Vucci, Louis)
April 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Terri Lemieux Plaintiff's Notice of Refiling and/or of Related Cases (Vucci, Louis)
March 27, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Applin, Nicholas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Responses due by 4/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Applin, Nicholas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses and to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Terri Lemieux. Responses due by 4/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Siliakus Order, #2 Exhibit DeRoy Order)(Vucci, Louis)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terri Lemieux (Vucci, Louis)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions per DE #9 Order. (vjk)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Forth the Court's Policy on Motions for Extension or Stay of the Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 03/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Referring Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan; Directing Parties to File Certificates of Interested Parties; Directing Parties to File a Notice of Refiling And/or of Related Cases; Requiring Completion of Form Consenting to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge; and Requiring Completion of Joint Scheduling Report and Form. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 03/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix) (dp)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (Applin, Nicholas)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Applin, Nicholas)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 5 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ail)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Terri Lemieux. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020.SEE DE #4 IMAGE (ail)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terri Lemieux Plaintiff's Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Vucci, Louis)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (jao)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc., a foreign for profit corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12426635, filed by Terri Lemieux. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Vucci, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemieux v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Allen Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lemieux
Represented By: Louis Anthony Vucci
Represented By: Eduardo Jesus Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?