Torrez v. District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Plaintiff: Hernald Torrez
Defendant: Mark Morgan, Linda Swacina, Field Office Directo Kristian M. Parker, Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), Director of the USCIS-Kendall Field Office, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS) and District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Case Number: 1:2020cv20650
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Hernald Torrez. Replies due by 4/15/2020. (Urizar, Mario)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
March 28, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Exempt this Case from Mediation by Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), Director of the USCIS-Kendall Field Office, District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS). (Bailyn, Jonathan)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Motion to Dismiss; in the response to the Motion, in addition to addressing Respondents' arguments, Petitioner's counsel shall show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against him for filing a Verified Petition containing materially false statements. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), Director of the USCIS-Kendall Field Office, District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS). Responses due by 4/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bailyn, Jonathan)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (tb)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 10/6/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga). Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Hernald Torrez (Urizar, Mario)
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Hernald Torrez (Urizar, Mario)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), Director of the USCIS-Kendall Field Office, District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS) (Bailyn, Jonathan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#8]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Hernald Torrez. Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020; Director of the USCIS-Kendall Field Office served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020; District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020; Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS) served on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. See image at DE #7 (lk)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hernald Torrez re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mail receipts)(Urizar, Mario)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Bailyn on behalf of Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), Director of the USCIS-Kendall Field Office, District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS). Attorney Jonathan Bailyn added to party Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP)(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Bailyn added to party Director of the USCIS-Kendall Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Bailyn added to party District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Bailyn added to party Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)(pty:dft). (Bailyn, Jonathan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), Director of the USCIS-Kendall Field Office, District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ar2)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ar2)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12450443, filed by Hernald Torrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Urizar, Mario)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrez v. District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernald Torrez
Represented By: Mario Rene Urizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Swacina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo Kristian M. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP)
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Jonathan Bailyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of the USCIS-Kendall Field Office
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Jonathan Bailyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Jonathan Bailyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Jonathan Bailyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?