Lucius v. Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Defendant: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv20834
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 3/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Windy Lucius. Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Cunningham, Juan)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference,Order Requiring Verified Statement in ADA Case and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (drz)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12514316, filed by Windy Lucius. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Cunningham, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucius v. Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Represented By: Juan Courtney Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?