GONZALEZ v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: JANET GONZALEZ
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv20985
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Striking 11 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, Document No. 10 by JANET GONZALEZ (Lage, Gustavo)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Notice (Other). Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (pes)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 STRICKEN - NOTICE by JANET GONZALEZ Order Scheduling Mediation (Lage, Gustavo) Modified per DE #12 on 4/22/2020 (pes).
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by JANET GONZALEZ re #7 Order Referring Case to Mediation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Scheduling Mediation) (Lage, Gustavo)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Peter E. Abraham as Mediator. (Lage, Gustavo)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 10/16/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the two-week period commencing 12/21/2020 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 12/15/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (mmc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Seipp, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket)(Seipp, John)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal cases. Removal status report due March 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12553329, filed by Ford Motor Company. State Court Answer Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - COMPLAINT & PLEADINGS, #3 Exhibit B - TRAFFIC CRASH REPORT, #4 Exhibit C - FOREIGN PROFIT CORP ANNUAL REPORT, #5 Exhibit D - FORM 10-K)(Seipp, John) Modified on 3/4/2020 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GONZALEZ v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Carolina Sofia Pinero
Represented By: Christine L. Welstead
Represented By: John Carl Seipp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET GONZALEZ
Represented By: Gustavo Daniel Lage
Represented By: Augusto Ramon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?