Sexton v. Carnival Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Skyler Wayne Sexton
Defendant: Carnival Corporation,, MALETSHABISA LYDIA MORIPE, DAYAN FANERY CAMPINO CASTILLO, JUILIETA DINO and Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv20990
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Carnival Corporation. (Eubanks, Cameron)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Carnival Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, Cameron)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies as moot #7 the Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Plaintiff's amended pleading moots the motion to dismiss the prior pleading. See Taylor v. Alabama, 275 F. App'x 836, 838 (11th Cir. 2008) (noting that when the plaintiffs amended their complaint the defendants motion to dismiss became moot). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against DAYAN FANERY CAMPINO CASTILLO, Carnival Corporation, JUILIETA DINO, MALETSHABISA LYDIA MORIPE, filed by Skyler Wayne Sexton.(Winkleman, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Unopposed Motion for Stay. Status Report due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay or to Administratively Close Case by Carnival Corporation. Responses due by 4/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, Cameron)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Carnival Corporation. Attorney Cameron Wayne Eubanks added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/15/2020 (Eubanks, Cameron)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Skyler Wayne Sexton. Carnival Corporation served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Margulies, Jason)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 3/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DAYAN FANERY CAMPINO CASTILLO, Carnival Corporation, JUILIETA DINO, MALETSHABISA LYDIA MORIPE. (ar2)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAYAN FANERY CAMPINO CASTILLO, Carnival Corporation,, JUILIETA DINO, MALETSHABISA LYDIA MORIPE. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12553771, filed by Skyler Wayne Sexton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Margulies, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sexton v. Carnival Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALETSHABISA LYDIA MORIPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAYAN FANERY CAMPINO CASTILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUILIETA DINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyler Wayne Sexton
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Represented By: Andrew Scott Freedman
Represented By: Michael A. Winkleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?