Longhini v. Hess Retail Stores LLC et al
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Defendant: Hess Retail Stores LLC and Speedway LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv21062
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Deborah Bovarnick Mastin. Mediation Hearing set for 8/27/2020 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed by 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Deborah Bovarnick Mastin as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 8/27/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Anthony)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Bench Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: ( Calendar Call set for 12/15/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Bench Trial set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. ) Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Doug Longhini (Attachments: #1 Supplement Joint Scheduling Form, #2 Supplement Election to Jurisdiction by Magistrate for Final Disposition of Motions, #3 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Perez, Anthony)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC, Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC (Boos, Eric)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Speedway LLC. Attorney Eric Stephen Boos added to party Speedway LLC(pty:dft). (Boos, Eric)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Hess Retail Stores LLC by Hess Retail Stores LLC (Boos, Eric)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers by April 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 4/15/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/13/2020. See attached document for full details.
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Doug Longhini. Hess Retail Stores LLC served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Doug Longhini. Speedway LLC served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hess Retail Stores LLC, Speedway LLC. (jao)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hess Retail Stores LLC, Speedway LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12579962, filed by Doug Longhini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons as to Hess, #3 Summon(s) Summons as to Speedway)(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longhini v. Hess Retail Stores LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Retail Stores LLC
Represented By: Eric Stephen Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Eric Stephen Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?