Biscayne Law Firm, P.A. et al v. Jenner
Appellant: UM Equity Partners, LLC., UV Group Holdings, LLC., UM Surplus Recovery, LLC. and Biscayne Law Firm, P.A.
Appellee: Michael Brandon Jenner
Case Number: 1:2020cv21269
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Case Numbers 20-cv-20484-BB and 20-cv-21269-BB are CONSOLIDATED with Case Number 20-cv-20481-BLOOM. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE Case Numbers 20-cv-20484-BB and 20-cv-21269-BB. All future filings shall be made in 20-cv-20481-BLOOM. The parties are also required to comply with all deadlines established by this Court in 20-cv-20481-BLOOM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
April 27, 2020 (SEE DE #10 FOR IMAGE) Civil Case Terminated. Case Numbers 20-cv-20484-BB and 20-cv-21269-BB are CONSOLIDATED with Case Number 20-cv-20481-BLOOM. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE Case Numbers 20-cv-20484-BB and 20-cv-21269-BB. All future filings shall be made in 20-cv-20481-BLOOM. The parties are also required to comply with all deadlines established by this Court in 20-cv-20481-BLOOM. (amb) Text Modified on 4/27/2020 (amb).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 04/24/2020. Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Initial Brief Amended re 7 Notice 8018 and Notice to Attorney,, by Biscayne Law Firm, P.A., UM Equity Partners, LLC., UM Surplus Recovery, LLC., UV Group Holdings, LLC.. Responses due by 5/7/2020 (Gleason, Kevin)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 5/18/2020. (jc)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 02/25/2020 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 24 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2020. (dcn)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Biscayne Law Firm, P.A., UM Surplus Recovery, LLC., UV Group Holdings, LLC., UM Equity Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet 18-22799-AJC, #2 Docket Sheet 19-1025-AJC, #3 Appellant's List of Designated Items and Statement of Issues, #4 Appellant's Designation, #5 Appellee's List of Designated Items, #6 Appellee's Designation from Case # 18-22799, #7 Appellee's Designation from AP Case # 19-1025)(dcn)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Biscayne Law Firm, P.A., UM Surplus Recovery, LLC., UV Group Holdings, LLC., UM Equity Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-22799-AJC, filed by UM Surplus Recovery, LLC., Biscayne Law Firm, P.A., UM Equity Partners, LLC., UV Group Holdings, LLC..(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biscayne Law Firm, P.A. et al v. Jenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UM Equity Partners, LLC.
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UV Group Holdings, LLC.
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: UM Surplus Recovery, LLC.
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Biscayne Law Firm, P.A.
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Brandon Jenner
Represented By: Michael S. Hoffman
Represented By: Morgan Benjamin Edelboim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?