Espinel v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Ada Espinel
Defendant: GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv21291
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (mws)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ada Espinel (Manzanilla, Leo)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter all the parties listed on the certificate that are missing. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ail)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate Geovera Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Geovera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc., Other Affiliate GeoVera Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Coastal Select Insurance Company for GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Young, Julia)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Young, Julia)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 1/14/2021 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 11/16/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Young, Julia)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 4/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Partial Transcription of RS, #2 Exhibit B - Obituary of Plaintiff)(Young, Julia)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12654689, filed by GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A. SOP, #2 Exhibit Ex B. Estimate, #3 Exhibit Ex C. Geovera Adjustment, #4 Exhibit Ex D. Policy, #5 Exhibit Ex E. Quit Claim, #6 Exhibit Ex F. Warranty Deed, #7 Exhibit Ex G. PL Property Search, #8 Exhibit Ex H. PL Obituary, #9 Exhibit Ex I. Geovera Corporate doc, #10 Docket Sheet State Docket, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #12 Supplement Copies of All Process, #13 Supplement State Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Supplement Issued Summons, #15 Supplement Complaint, #16 Supplement D MFET)(Young, Julia) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 3/26/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinel v. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Espinel
Represented By: Leo A. Manzanilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Julia Grimke Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?