Chacon v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Maurin Chacon
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv21292
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Re: #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Maurin Chacon, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion: Reply now due by 6/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/19/2020. (EGT)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Response to Order to Show Cause by Maurin Chacon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klugh, Richard)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by United States of America. (Vazquez, Ignacio)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting DE #5 MOTION to Continue TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PETITIONERS MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2255.**Response due 5/15/2020.** Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/28/2020. (mso)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PETITIONERS MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2255 by United States of America. Responses due by 5/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vazquez, Ignacio)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Administrative Order: Directing Service of Response to Petition within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 3/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (EGT)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ignacio Jesus Vazquez, Jr on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Ignacio Jesus Vazquez, Jr added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Vazquez, Ignacio)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (ar2)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate Sentence (2255) . NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 14-20017), filed by Maurin Chacon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klugh, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chacon v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurin Chacon
Represented By: Richard Carroll Klugh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: Ignacio Jesus Vazquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?