MENDOZA et al v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: GELASIO R. MENDOZA and SARA MENDOZA
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv21293
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) by GELASIO R. MENDOZA, SARA MENDOZA (Conger, Ayesa)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for August 27, 2020, 2:30 p.m.. (Arrizabalaga, Markel)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Markel Arrizabalaga, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 4/27/2020 at 2:30 PM Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 7 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Markel Arrizabalaga. (Conger, Ayesa)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Notice (Other). Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (jas)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by GELASIO R. MENDOZA, SARA MENDOZA of Selection of Mediator and Notice of Scheduling Mediation (Joint) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Conger, Ayesa)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 4/17/2020. Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Expert Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Fact Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 4/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/18/2020. Motions due by 9/18/2020. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/25/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 11/4/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ayesa Conger on behalf of GELASIO R. MENDOZA, SARA MENDOZA. Attorney Ayesa Conger added to party GELASIO R. MENDOZA(pty:pla), Attorney Ayesa Conger added to party SARA MENDOZA(pty:pla). (Conger, Ayesa)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12656330, filed by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Appendix State - Docket, #6 Appendix State - Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Appendix State - Complaint, #8 Appendix State - Pltfs' RFA to Deft, #9 Appendix State - Pltfs' RFP to Deft, #10 Appendix State - Pltfs' Roggs to Deft, #11 Appendix State - Pltfs' NOF Policy, #12 Appendix State - Pltfs' Ntc Depo Dates, #13 Appendix State - Proposed Summons, #14 Appendix State - Issued Summons, #15 Appendix State - Pltfs' NOF SOP, #16 Appendix Deft's NOA, #17 Appendix Deft's Ans & Affirm Def)(Poljak, Stephen) Text Modified on 3/26/2020 (cds). Answer Filed (See Exh 17)/ No Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDOZA et al v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GELASIO R. MENDOZA
Represented By: Thomas A Singer
Represented By: Ayesa Conger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA MENDOZA
Represented By: Thomas A Singer
Represented By: Ayesa Conger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen John Poljak
Represented By: Danielle Robinson
Represented By: Isabel Andreacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?