Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Co. and Geico Casualty Co.
Defendant: Brian Layton, P.A., Mark Brockelman, Alberto Rivera, M.D., Michael White, D.C., Karen Amar, D.C., Ryan Fulcher, Nelinda Lopez, D.C., Peter Warheit, M.D., John Crocco, P.A., Anthony Danieli, D.C., Jennifer Englander, D.C., Danny Feder, D.C., Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC., Henry Sanon, D.C., Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D., TCFII Spine LLC., Samuel Hess, M.D. and Steven Greenberg, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2020cv21459
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/10/2021 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 5/4/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Ryan Fulcher, Steven Greenberg, M.D., Alberto Rivera, M.D., Anthony Danieli, D.C., Brian Layton, P.A., Mark Brockelman, Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC., Henry Sanon, D.C., Jennifer Englander, D.C., John Crocco, P.A., Karen Amar, D.C., Michael White, D.C., Nelinda Lopez, D.C., Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D., Peter Warheit, M.D., Samuel Hess, M.D., TCFII Spine LLC. (Benayoun, Avi)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Peral on behalf of Ryan Fulcher, Steven Greenberg, M.D., Alberto Rivera, M.D., Anthony Danieli, D.C., Brian Layton, P.A., Mark Brockelman, Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC., Henry Sanon, D.C., Jennifer Englander, D.C., John Crocco, P.A., Karen Amar, D.C., Michael White, D.C., Nelinda Lopez, D.C., Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D., Peter Warheit, M.D., Samuel Hess, M.D., TCFII Spine LLC.. Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Ryan Fulcher(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Steven Greenberg, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Alberto Rivera, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Anthony Danieli, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Brian Layton, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Mark Brockelman(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Henry Sanon, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Jennifer Englander, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party John Crocco, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Karen Amar, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Michael White, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Nelinda Lopez, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Peter Warheit, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party Samuel Hess, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Peral added to party TCFII Spine LLC.(pty:dft). (Peral, Stephanie)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Neil Kreitzer on behalf of Ryan Fulcher, Steven Greenberg, M.D., Alberto Rivera, M.D., Anthony Danieli, D.C., Brian Layton, P.A., Mark Brockelman, Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC., Henry Sanon, D.C., Jennifer Englander, D.C., John Crocco, P.A., Karen Amar, D.C., Michael White, D.C., Nelinda Lopez, D.C., Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D., Peter Warheit, M.D., Samuel Hess, M.D., TCFII Spine LLC.. Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Ryan Fulcher(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Steven Greenberg, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Alberto Rivera, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Anthony Danieli, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Brian Layton, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Mark Brockelman(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Henry Sanon, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Jennifer Englander, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party John Crocco, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Karen Amar, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Michael White, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Nelinda Lopez, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Peter Warheit, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party Samuel Hess, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Neil Kreitzer added to party TCFII Spine LLC.(pty:dft). (Kreitzer, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Marino, John)
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holiday Hunt Russell on behalf of Nelinda Lopez, D.C.. Attorney Holiday Hunt Russell added to party Nelinda Lopez, D.C.(pty:dft). (Russell, Holiday)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties have through May 29, 2020 to file a joint scheduling report and certificates of interested parties. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties re #11 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Responses due by 6/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marino, John)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 5/19/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint, Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Geico Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Co., Geico Indemnity Co.. All Defendants shall file one combined response or separate answers to the Complaint on or before July 15, 202 Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Ryan Fulcher, Steven Greenberg, M.D., Alberto Rivera, M.D., Anthony Danieli, D.C., Brian Layton, P.A., Mark Brockelman, Danny Feder, D.C., Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC., Henry Sanon, D.C., Jennifer Englander, D.C., Karen Amar, D.C., Michael White, D.C., Nelinda Lopez, D.C., Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D., Peter Warheit, M.D., Samuel Hess, M.D., TCFII Spine LLC.. Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Ryan Fulcher(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Steven Greenberg, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Alberto Rivera, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Anthony Danieli, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Brian Layton, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Mark Brockelman(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Danny Feder, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Henry Sanon, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Jennifer Englander, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Karen Amar, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Michael White, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Nelinda Lopez, D.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Peter Warheit, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party Samuel Hess, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Avi Benayoun added to party TCFII Spine LLC.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benayoun, Avi)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that on or before July 5, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendants or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by July 5 will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Barry I. Levy. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Barry I. Levy. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12739486 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Responses due by 4/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Marino, John)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Marino, John)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office - Miami) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (cds)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ryan Fulcher, Steven Greenberg, M.D., Alberto Rivera, M.D., Anthony Danieli, D.C., Brian Layton, P.A., Mark Brockelman, Danny Feder, D.C., Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC., Henry Sanon, D.C., Jennifer Englander, D.C., John Crocco, P.A., Karen Amar, D.C., Michael White, D.C., Nelinda Lopez, D.C., Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D., Peter Warheit, M.D., Samuel Hess, M.D., TCFII Spine LLC.. (cds)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12700537, filed by Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1 -Exhibit to Complaint)(Marino, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Layton, P.A.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brockelman
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Rivera, M.D.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael White, D.C.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Amar, D.C.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Fulcher
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelinda Lopez, D.C.
Represented By: Holiday Hunt Russell
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Warheit, M.D.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crocco, P.A.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Danieli, D.C.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Englander, D.C.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Feder, D.C.
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Spine and Joint Institute, LLC.
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Sanon, D.C.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Javier Tort-Saade, M.D.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCFII Spine LLC.
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Hess, M.D.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Greenberg, M.D.
Represented By: Stephanie Peral
Represented By: Avi Benayoun
Represented By: Michael Neil Kreitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Lindsey Ryan Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Lindsey Ryan Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: Lindsey Ryan Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Casualty Co.
Represented By: Lindsey Ryan Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?