Adebiyi v. Florida Department of Health et al
Plaintiff: Adenike Adebiyi
Defendant: Dr. Abramson, Florida Department of Health and Palmetto General Hospital
Case Number: 1:2020cv21484
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Abramson, Florida Department of Health, Palmetto General Hospital, filed by Adenike Adebiyi.(mc)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Reinstate Case by Adenike Adebiyi. (mc)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adenike Adebiyi (System updated) (mc)
April 28, 2020 Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. (Terminated Per Order Closing Case DE#8 ) (drz)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Administrative Order Closing Case. CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Motions terminated: #7 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program filed by Adenike Adebiyi. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Adenike Adebiyi. (drz)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adenike Adebiyi (Address Updated in CM/ECF). (drz)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Adenike Adebiyi, as to #1 Complaint. ( Amended Complaint due by 4/27/2020.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/7/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006845 (pcs)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Abramson, Florida Department of Health, Palmetto General Hospital. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Adenike Adebiyi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adebiyi v. Florida Department of Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adenike Adebiyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?