Hernandez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Antonio Hernandez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv21885
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until August 13, 2020, to file an Answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/2/2020. (kou)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance by Antonio Hernandez re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Set/Reset Deadlines, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Russomanno, Herman)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by United States of America. Attorney Suzette A. Smikle added to party United States of America (pty:dft). Responses due by 7/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smikle, Suzette) Modified Relief on 7/2/2020 (ls).
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America of Lien. Attorney David Michael Tarlow added to party United States of America (pty:dft). (Tarlow, David)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Antonio Hernandez. United States of America served on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Russomanno, Herman)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER Regarding Phone Calls to Chambers. The following rules apply in this and all other civil matters pending before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: 1. Do not call Chambers to ask about the status of pending motions, including motions for extension of time. The Court is aware of all pending motions and will address each of them in due course. 2. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek, or seek to provide, can be conveyed through a filing on the docket. 3. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek is available from other sources, including Court Orders and the Local Rules. 4. If you call Chambers for a permissible purpose, counsel for all affected parties must be on the line. Calls from non-attorneys and ex parte calls will not be accepted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/6/2020. (kou)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America (jao)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12844853, filed by Antonio Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Russomanno, Herman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Hernandez
Represented By: Herman Joseph Russomanno, III
Represented By: Herman Joseph Russomanno
Represented By: Robert John Borrello
Represented By: Christopher S. Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: David Michael Tarlow
Represented By: Suzette A. Smikle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?