Breaux v. Saul
Plaintiff: Violet Breaux
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv21917
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals as to U.S. Attorney served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (mee)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that on or before August 5, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by August 5 will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re 6 Order. Summons, complaint and order forwarded to Marshal's for service. (cbr)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cbr)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER regarding #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U.S. Marshals Service is directed to serve the Complaint and summonses on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/7/2020. (jzn)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance with Order Granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Request for Service by U.S. Marshal by Violet Breaux re 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's counsel shall have until May 21, 2020, to specifically indicate if service by the U.S. Marshal is requested for the complaint and summonses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/7/2020. (jzn)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Violet Breaux. (mee)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Violet Breaux. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 IFP Application)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breaux v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Breaux
Represented By: Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?