Perez v. C.G.T.J. INVESTMENTS, LLC.
Appellee: C.G.T.J. INVESTMENTS, LLC.
Appellant: Lorenzo Perez, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv21940
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 9 : Response due by 7/3/2020 (lk)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant Lorenzo Perez, Jr. shall file his response to Appellee C.G.T.J. INVESTMENTS, LLC's motion to dismiss #5 on or before July 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/30/2020. (sgi)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Lorenzo Perez, Jr. Attorney Jessica Serrano added to party Lorenzo Perez, Jr(pty:a). (Serrano, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 7/15/2020. (jc)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Lorenzo Perez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 APPELLANT DESIGNATION, #3 APPELLEE DESIGNATION)(lle)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by C.G.T.J. INVESTMENTS, LLC.. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Penson, John)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua) Modified text on 5/8/2020 (jc).
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Lorenzo Perez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 20-11599-LMI, filed by Lorenzo Perez, Jr.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. C.G.T.J. INVESTMENTS, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: C.G.T.J. INVESTMENTS, LLC.
Represented By: John Lodge Penson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lorenzo Perez, Jr.
Represented By: Julio Cesar Marrero
Represented By: Jessica Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?