Machado v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Allan Machado
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22263
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pena, Kelly)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Pena, Kelly)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Patrick Hammon on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Christopher Patrick Hammon added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (pty:dft). (Hammon, Christopher)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Kelly Marie Pena added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (pty:dft). (Pena, Kelly)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Allan Machado. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Levy, Michelle)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (ebz)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12964727, filed by Allan Machado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)(Levy, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Machado v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Machado
Represented By: Michelle C. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Hammon
Represented By: Kelly Marie Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?