Christie v. ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD. et al
Plaintiff: William Christie
Defendant: AGA Service Company, ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD., A foreign corporation, Jefferson Insurance Company, Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. and AGA Service Company doing business as Allianz Global Assistance
Case Number: 1:2020cv22439
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by William Christie. Replies due by 8/12/2020. (Flanagan, Michael)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by AGA Service Company, Jefferson Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/6/2020 (Latimer, Walter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by William Christie (Flanagan, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruno Renda on behalf of AGA Service Company, Jefferson Insurance Company. Attorney Bruno Renda added to party AGA Service Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruno Renda added to party Jefferson Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Renda, Bruno)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter George Latimer on behalf of AGA Service Company, Jefferson Insurance Company (Latimer, Walter)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AGA Service Company, Jefferson Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent AWP USA Inc, Corporate Parent AWP P & CSA, Corporate Parent Allianz Partners S.A.S. for AGA Service Company, Jefferson Insurance Company (Latimer, Walter)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valerie Shea on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Valerie Shea added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Shea, Valerie)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Drahos on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Michael J. Drahos added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Drahos, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Defendants' motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. #9 . The deadline for the Defendants to respond to the complaint is July 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by AGA Service Company, Jefferson Insurance Company. Attorney Cameron Wayne Eubanks added to party AGA Service Company(pty:dft), Attorney Cameron Wayne Eubanks added to party Jefferson Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, Cameron)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by William Christie. AGA Service Company served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Flanagan, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by William Christie. Jefferson Insurance Company served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Flanagan, Michael)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Christie. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Flanagan, Michael)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AGA Service Company, Jefferson Insurance Company, Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (cds)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13023147, filed by William Christie. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) AGA Service Company, #2 Summon(s) Jefferson Insurance Company, #3 Summon(s) Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit "1" Insurance Policy)(Flanagan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christie v. ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGA Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD., A foreign corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter George Latimer
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Eubanks
Represented By: Bruno Renda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.
Represented By: Valerie Shea
Represented By: Michael J. Drahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGA Service Company doing business as Allianz Global Assistance
Represented By: Walter George Latimer
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Eubanks
Represented By: Bruno Renda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Christie
Represented By: Michael T Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?