Ortiz v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Ortiz
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General and Secretary D.H.S.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22449
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Secretary D.H.S., U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Werner, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E. Werner on behalf of Secretary D.H.S., U.S. Attorney General. Attorney David E. Werner added to party Secretary D.H.S.(pty:dft), Attorney David E. Werner added to party U.S. Attorney General(pty:dft). (Werner, David)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243, within three days, on or before June 19, 2020, the Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted and shall file therewith all documents and transcripts necessary for the resolution of this petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/16/2020. (rm01)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander Ortiz. (pcs)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 IFP Filed, filed by Alexander Ortiz.(pcs) Modified on 6/15/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: David E. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary D.H.S.
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: David E. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?