Taddeo v. McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Plaintiff: Peter M. Taddeo
Defendant: McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22498
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #18 Transmittal Letter Sent, #17 Order Remanding Case to State Court (pcs)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit, Miami-Dade County, Florida. State Court Case Number: 20-010885-CA-01 (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of Order) (pcs)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REMANDING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 16, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Remand with Agreed Damages by McLaren Automotive, Inc. (Allaman, Melissa)
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 8 Order to Show Cause,, by McLaren Automotive, Inc.. (Allaman, Melissa)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 8 Order to Show Cause,, by Peter M. Taddeo. (Wikgren, Brent)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 7/13/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by McLaren Automotive, Inc. re #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Civil Coversheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Civil Coversheet, #5 Interrogatories to Defendant, #6 Request for Production, #7 Request for Admissions, #8 Notice of Service of Interrogatories, #9 Summons to be Issued to McLaren Automotive, #10 Summons Issued to McLaren Automotive, #11 Designation of Email Addresses, #12 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Allaman, Melissa)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by McLaren Automotive, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Allaman, Melissa)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Scott Wikgren on behalf of Peter M. Taddeo (Wikgren, Brent)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Scott Wikgren on behalf of Peter M. Taddeo. Attorney Brent Scott Wikgren added to party Peter M. Taddeo(pty:pla). (Wikgren, Brent)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On June 18, 2020, the Court issued an Order #3 requiring that "WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, the Parties shall file a joint conference report and a joint proposed scheduling order, as required by S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1(b)." To date, the Parties have failed to file a joint conference report or a joint proposed scheduling order. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Parties shall SHOW CAUSE by July 13, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. as to why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/6/2020. (shy)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by McLaren Automotive, Inc. re #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Civil Coversheet, #3 Complaint, #4 State Court Civil Coversheet, #5 Interrogatories to Defendant, #6 Request for Production, #7 Requests for Admissions, #8 Notice of Service of Interrogatories, #9 Summons to be Issued to McLaren, #10 Summons Issued to McLaren, #11 Designation of Email Addresses, #12 Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Allaman, Melissa)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by McLaren Automotive, Inc. (Allaman, Melissa)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by McLaren Automotive, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent McLaren Finance plc for McLaren Automotive, Inc. (Allaman, Melissa)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by McLaren Automotive, Inc.. (Allaman, Melissa)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Written Discovery Requests) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13043202, filed by McLaren Automotive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allaman, Melissa) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 6/17/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taddeo v. McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Fletcher Allaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter M. Taddeo
Represented By: Emily Lora Mallor
Represented By: Brent Scott Wikgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?