Sanchez Ramirez v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Sanchez Ramirez
Defendant: KENNETH CUCCINELLI II, male, Chad F. Wolf, Linda M. Swacina, WILLIAM BARR, Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Attorney General of the United States and Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Case Number: 1:2020cv22545
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Edward Cheek on behalf of Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), Attorney General of the United States, District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). Attorney Christopher Edward Cheek added to party Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Edward Cheek added to party Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS)(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Edward Cheek added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Edward Cheek added to party District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)(pty:dft). (Cheek, Christopher)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office - Miami) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noticing INS Attorney on behalf of Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), Attorney General of the United States, District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) (asl)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), Attorney General of the United States, District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), and U.S. Attorney. (jao)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13056865, filed by Juan Carlos Sanchez Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s))(Ackerman, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez Ramirez v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH CUCCINELLI II, male
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda M. Swacina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: Christopher Edward Cheek
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: Christopher Edward Cheek
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Christopher Edward Cheek
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Represented By: Christopher Edward Cheek
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Sanchez Ramirez
Represented By: Kevin Paul Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?