Rojas v. U.S. Department of the Army et al
Plaintiff: Walter Rojas
Defendant: Secretary Ryan D. McCarthy and U.S. Department of the Army
Case Number: 1:2020cv22587
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Compliance (copy of order mailed to plaintiff) re #20 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant. (mee)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER: requiring the Plaintiff Walter Rojas to file the appropriate summonses on the docket, identifying the parties to be served as per Rule 4, as required by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres's prior order. #14 . The deadline to file the appropriate summonses is September 8, 2020. Failure to comply with this order will result in sanctions up to and including dismissal. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Compliance (copy of order mailed to plaintiff) re #17 Order on Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program, Order on Report and Recommendations,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, (mee)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART THE MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, granting #5 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program;affirms and adopts #15 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling; denying as moot #16 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to Request an Attorney Assigned by the Court/MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Walter Rojas. Responses due by 8/17/2020 (mee)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program filed by Walter Rojas. Recommending that Plaintiff's Motion be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (js02)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (js02)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (js02)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: referring the Plaintiff's motion for referral to volunteer attorney program #5 and the Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file the case #6 to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for either an order or a report and recommendations, consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1 of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (dka)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance (copy of order mailed to plaintiff) re #9 Order Referring Motion, (mee)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING MOTION AND 1915 DETERMINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Walter Rojas. Motions referred to Judge Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance (copy of order mailed to plaintiff) re #7 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (mee)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file the case. re #1 Complaint by Walter Rojas. Responses due by 7/7/2020 (jao)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Walter Rojas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(jao)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending (jao)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter Rojas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(jao)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan D. McCarthy, U.S. Department of the Army. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Walter Rojas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas v. U.S. Department of the Army et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Ryan D. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?