Grove Resolutions, LLC v. NLG, LLC
Plaintiff: Grove Resolutions, LLC
Defendant: NLG, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv22601
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Grove Resolutions, LLC. (Callison, Orion)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by NLG, LLC. Replies due by 7/28/2020. (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Bankruptcy Appeal filed by NLG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gabbe, Astrid)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Grove Resolutions, LLC. Replies due by 7/15/2020. (Callison, Orion)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 7/7/2020. Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grove Resolutions, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Alexis Gonzalez, Esq. for Grove Resolutions, LLC (Callison, Orion)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Grove Resolutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callison, Orion)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Bankruptcy Appeal by NLG, LLC. Responses due by 7/21/2020 (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by NLG, LLC (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NLG, LLC re #3 Order,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Gabbe, Astrid)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Grove Resolutions, LLC v. NLG, LLC) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13073428, filed by NLG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NLG's Final Judgment of Foreclosure, #2 Exhibit Removed State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gabbe, Astrid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grove Resolutions, LLC v. NLG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NLG, LLC
Represented By: Astrid Evelyn Gabbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grove Resolutions, LLC
Represented By: Orion G. Callison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?