United States of America v. Bode et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Raul Bode and Odalys Bode
Case Number: 1:2020cv22663
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Lester Langer; Mediation report due by 12/7/2020. Mediation Hearing set for 12/4/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Report Regarding. Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (jas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT REGARDING Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Coulson, Christopher)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Calendar Call set for 3/23/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Bench Trial set for 3/29/2021 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. ), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 12/7/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coulson, Christopher)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 First Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Odalys Bode, Raul Bode (Lapekas, Karen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America (Coulson, Christopher)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time permitted by the rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Odalys Bode, Raul Bode. All Defendants. (Lapekas, Karen)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen J Lapekas on behalf of Odalys Bode, Raul Bode. Attorney Karen J Lapekas added to party Odalys Bode(pty:dft), Attorney Karen J Lapekas added to party Raul Bode(pty:dft). (Lapekas, Karen)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Odalys Bode, Raul Bode. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silverblatt, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bode et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Bode
Represented By: Karen J Lapekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odalys Bode
Represented By: Karen J Lapekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher J. Coulson
Represented By: Robert Scott Silverblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?