Santessi v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Santessi
Defendant: National Auto Lenders, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Popular, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., TransUnion, LLC and Popular, Inc. doing business as Popular Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv22689
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by National Auto Lenders, Inc.. (Graham, John)
August 28, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Taormina, Alisa)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal as to these Defendants within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. Furthermore, the Court retains jurisdiction over the parties until the settlement is consummated. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Settlement as to Popular, Inc. db Popular Bank by Martin Santessi (Zeig, Justin)
August 27, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services LLC by Martin Santessi (Zeig, Justin)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that by August 28, 2020, the parties shall submit a proposed order scheduling mediation. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 25, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Gill S Freeman as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/11/2021. (Taormina, Alisa)
August 10, 2020 Filing 31 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Martin Santessi (Zeig, Justin)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMANS DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Plaintiff, Martin Santessi, shall comply with the July 22, 2020 Order [ECF No. 9] by by 8/7/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 6/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 4, 2020 Filing 27 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Martin Santessi (Zeig, Justin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 26 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Popular, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate E-LOAN, Inc., Other Affiliate Popular North America, Inc., Other Affiliate Popular Bank, Other Affiliate BP Eureka House SPV, LLC, Other Affiliate BP Faros del Oeste SPV, LLC, Other Affiliate BPPR SRL Investment Fund I, LLC, Other Affiliate Popular Auto LLC, Other Affiliate Popular Community Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate Popular Mezzanine Fund LLC, Other Affiliate PR Rent-to-Own LLC, Other Affiliate Popular Capital Trust I, Other Affiliate Popular Capital Trust II, Other Affiliate Popular Insurance LLC, Other Affiliate Popular International Bank, Inc., Other Affiliate Popular Life RE, Other Affiliate Popular ABS, Inc., Other Affiliate Popular Equipment Finance, Inc., Other Affiliate Popular Insurance Agency USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Popular North America Capital Trust I, Other Affiliate Popular Risk Services LLC, Other Affiliate Popular Securities LLC, Other Affiliate PCC SUB-CDE I, LLC, Other Affiliate Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Other Affiliate Equity One, Inc. for Popular, Inc. (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document All Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers by August 28, 2020. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Martin Santessi. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Meier, Alexander)
July 30, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Equifax Information Services, LLC Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Meier, Alexander)
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Comlaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Alexander Charles Meier added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meier, Alexander)
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC (Long, Charlotte)
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by TransUnion, LLC. Attorney Charlotte Ann Long added to party TransUnion, LLC(pty:dft). (Long, Charlotte)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Popular, Inc.. Attorney Alejandro Jose Cepeda-Diaz added to party Popular, Inc.(pty:dft). (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated secondary email information for attorney John Spencer Graham re #13 Notice of Attorney Appearance. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Court's website for detailed instructions on updating your information. https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information. (cw)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; denying as moot #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by National Auto Lenders, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham, John)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Auto Lenders, Inc. (Graham, John)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Spencer Graham on behalf of National Auto Lenders, Inc.. Attorney John Spencer Graham added to party National Auto Lenders, Inc.(pty:dft). (Graham, John)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Chipi, Nicole)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Taormina, Alisa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Alisa M Taormina added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/6/2020 (Taormina, Alisa)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 8/3/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall not file a response until all Defendants have been served. Once all Defendants have been served, the Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chipi, Nicole)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Chipi, Nicole)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Kristine Chipi on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Nicole Kristine Chipi added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). (Chipi, Nicole)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that on or before September 28, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendants or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., National Auto Lenders, Inc., Popular, Inc., TransUnion, LLC. (cds)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., National Auto Lenders, Inc., Popular, Inc., TransUnion, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13104784, filed by Martin Santessi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) chase, #3 Summon(s) equifax, #4 Summon(s) experian, #5 Summon(s) national auto, #6 Summon(s) popular, #7 Summon(s) transunion)(Zeig, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santessi v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Auto Lenders, Inc.
Represented By: John Spencer Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Kristine Chipi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Charles Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa M Taormina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Charlotte Ann Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popular, Inc. doing business as Popular Bank
Represented By: Alejandro Jose Cepeda-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Santessi
Represented By: Justin E. Zeig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?