Villegas v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Villegas
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22953
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Guadalupe Villegas. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Flanagan, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.. (ebz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand For Jury Trial against Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13197229, filed by Guadalupe Villegas. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flanagan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villegas v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Villegas
Represented By: Michael T Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?