SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC v. JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC and Equityfeed Corporation
Defendant: MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,, JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, Zachary Westphal, STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC., Timothy Bohen and Timothy Sykes
Case Number: 1:2020cv22957
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Lage, Gustavo)
August 10, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC. MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC waiver sent on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Lage, Gustavo)
August 10, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Lage, Gustavo)
August 10, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC. MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Florida Limited Liability Company) waiver sent on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Lage, Gustavo)
August 10, 2020 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Timothy Bohen waiver sent on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Lage, Gustavo)
August 10, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Zachary Westphal waiver sent on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Lage, Gustavo)
August 10, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Timothy Sykes waiver sent on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Lage, Gustavo)
August 10, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC. JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC waiver sent on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Lage, Gustavo)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendants' motion to appear pro hac vice #28 . Attorney Joseph Meckes is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendants. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendants' motion to appear pro hac vice #27 . Attorney Gabriel Colwell is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendants. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
August 6, 2020 Attorney Joseph A. Meckes representing Westphal, Zachary (Defendant) and Bohen, Timothy (Defendant) and STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC. (Defendant); Activated. (cco)
August 5, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph Meckes. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Timothy Bohen, STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC., Zachary Westphal. Responses due by 8/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manon, Raul)
August 5, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gabriel Colwell. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Timothy Bohen, STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC., Zachary Westphal. Responses due by 8/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manon, Raul)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendants' motion to appear pro hac vice #24 . Attorney Brett D. Jaffe is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendants. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice and with leave to refile, the Defendants' motions to appear pro hac vice #22 , #23 . Local Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys requires local counsel to consent to "be required to file and serve all documents and things that may be filed and served electronically, and who shall be responsible for filing and serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures." Local counsel only consented to file documents. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
August 5, 2020 Attorney Brett D. Jaffe representing JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant) and Sykes, Timothy (Defendant) and MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC, (Defendant); and MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC (Defendant); and MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC, (Defendant); Activated. (cco)
August 5, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brett D. Jaffe. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13298481 by JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Colorado limited liability corporation), MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Florida Limited Liability Company), Timothy Sykes. Responses due by 8/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elegant, Justin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph Meckes. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13295358 by Timothy Bohen, STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC., Zachary Westphal. Responses due by 8/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manon, Raul)
August 4, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gabriel Colwell. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13295313 by Timothy Bohen, STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC., Zachary Westphal. Responses due by 8/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manon, Raul)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendants' motion to appear pro hac vice #16 . Attorney Cassandra K. Johnson is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendants. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendants' motion to appear pro hac vice #15 . Attorney Steven R. Campbell is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendants. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice and with leave to refile the Defendants motion to appear pro hac vice #14 . The receipt number provided was invalid, and the payment of the filing fee cannot be verified. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER: denying the Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint as premature. #13 . The Defendants have not yet been served, and therefore, there is no deadline to respond to the complaint for the Court to extend. The Court notes that Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d)(3) would provide the Defendant with 60 days to respond to the complaint if they waive service. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 8/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Cassandra K. Johnson. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13294157 by JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Colorado limited liability corporation), MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Florida Limited Liability Company), Timothy Sykes. Responses due by 8/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elegant, Justin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven R. Campbell. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13294083 by JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Colorado limited liability corporation), MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Florida Limited Liability Company), Timothy Sykes. Responses due by 8/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elegant, Justin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brett D. Jaffe. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-6237766.2008041jgz. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Colorado limited liability corporation), MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Florida Limited Liability Company), Timothy Sykes. Responses due by 8/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elegant, Justin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, (Unopposed) by Timothy Bohen, JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Colorado limited liability corporation), MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Florida Limited Liability Company), STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC., Timothy Sykes, Zachary Westphal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elegant, Justin)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY MATTERS TOTHE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arun Gopal Ravindran on behalf of JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Colorado limited liability corporation), MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Florida Limited Liability Company), Timothy Sykes. Attorney Arun Gopal Ravindran added to party JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Arun Gopal Ravindran added to party MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Arun Gopal Ravindran added to party MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(pty:dft), Attorney Arun Gopal Ravindran added to party MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(pty:dft), Attorney Arun Gopal Ravindran added to party Timothy Sykes (pty:dft). (Ravindran, Arun)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin B. Elegant on behalf of JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Colorado limited liability corporation), MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Florida Limited Liability Company), Timothy Sykes. Attorney Justin B. Elegant added to party JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin B. Elegant added to party MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin B. Elegant added to party MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(pty:dft), Attorney Justin B. Elegant added to party MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(pty:dft), Attorney Justin B. Elegant added to party Timothy Sykes (pty:dft). (Elegant, Justin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raul B. Manon on behalf of Timothy Bohen, STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC., Zachary Westphal. Attorney Raul B. Manon added to party Timothy Bohen(pty:dft), Attorney Raul B. Manon added to party STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Raul B. Manon added to party Zachary Westphal(pty:dft). (Manon, Raul)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (cbr)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Timothy Sykes. (cbr)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC re #1 Complaint,, filed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Lage, Gustavo)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Colorado limited liability corporation), MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,(a Florida Limited Liability Company), STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC., Zachary Westphal. (mee)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - the Defendant's address is not listed. (mee)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. Text Modified on 7/20/2020 (mee).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Bohen, JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC, MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,, STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC., Timothy Sykes, Zachary Westphal. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-13198935, payment transferred from : 20-cv-22957 SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC vs. JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC, et al., filed by SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s))(Lage, Gustavo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC v. JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCANZ TECHNOLOGIES, INC
Represented By: Gustavo Daniel Lage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equityfeed Corporation
Represented By: Gustavo Daniel Lage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLIONAIRE MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Arun Gopal Ravindran
Represented By: Justin B. Elegant
Represented By: Brett D. Jaffe
Represented By: Cassandra K. Johnson
Represented By: Steven R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLIONAIRE PUBLISHING, LLC,
Represented By: Arun Gopal Ravindran
Represented By: Justin B. Elegant
Represented By: Brett D. Jaffe
Represented By: Cassandra K. Johnson
Represented By: Steven R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEWMON ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Arun Gopal Ravindran
Represented By: Justin B. Elegant
Represented By: Brett D. Jaffe
Represented By: Cassandra K. Johnson
Represented By: Steven R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Westphal
Represented By: Gabriel Colwell
Represented By: Raul B. Manon
Represented By: Joseph A. Meckes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STOCKSTOTRADE.COM INC.
Represented By: Gabriel Colwell
Represented By: Raul B. Manon
Represented By: Joseph A. Meckes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bohen
Represented By: Gabriel Colwell
Represented By: Raul B. Manon
Represented By: Joseph A. Meckes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sykes
Represented By: Arun Gopal Ravindran
Represented By: Justin B. Elegant
Represented By: Brett D. Jaffe
Represented By: Cassandra K. Johnson
Represented By: Steven R. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?