Schaaf v. EIMS USA, INC.
Plaintiff: Martin Schaaf
Defendant: EIMS USA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv22959
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by EIMS USA, INC.. (Ryan, Cynthia)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/26/2020. (rrt)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint and Jury Demand by EIMS USA, INC.. Attorney Cynthia Brennan Ryan added to party EIMS USA, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Cynthia) Modified Relief on 8/26/2020 (ls).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMANS DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non- Dispositive Matters AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to EIMS USA, INC.. (cqs)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) 2nd by Martin Schaaf re #4 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) filed by Martin Schaaf, 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Dusek, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents.EIMS USA, Inc to match the initiating documents. (cqs)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Corrected Original Summons by Martin Schaaf re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Dusek, James)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (cds)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EIMS USA, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13200057, filed by Martin Schaaf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Dusek, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaaf v. EIMS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EIMS USA, INC.
Represented By: Cynthia Brennan Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Schaaf
Represented By: James Edward Dusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?