Carver-Pecku v. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Carver-Pecku
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD
Case Number: 1:2020cv22972
Filed: July 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 10/8/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline Carver-Pecku. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Falzon, Anthony)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. (kpe)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. by Jacqueline Carver-Pecku re #1 Complaint filed by Jacqueline Carver-Pecku (Falzon, Anthony)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jacqueline Carver-Pecku re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case re Civil Cover Sheet (Falzon, Anthony)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (kpe)
July 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
July 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13203954, filed by Jacqueline Carver-Pecku.(Falzon, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carver-Pecku v. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Carver-Pecku
Represented By: Anthony Vincent Falzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?