Zamora v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Velez Zamora
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv23052
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Maria Velez Zamora. All Defendants. Commissioner of Social Security served on 08/4/2020, answer due 10/05/2020; U.S. Attorney served on 8/6/2020, answer due 10/05/2020; U.S. Attorney General served 8/5/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Segarra, Luis) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (kpe).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that on or before October 21, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by October 21 will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kpe)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Maria Velez Zamora re #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Attorney General of USA, #2 Summon(s) Commissioner of SSA, #3 Summon(s) US Atty SD of FL) (Segarra, Luis)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 (Amended) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maria Velez Zamora. (Segarra, Luis)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until July 28, 2020 to file an amended and complete application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs. Plaintiff is reminded her application is signed under penalty of perjury. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maria Velez Zamora. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit to proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Segarra, Luis)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The filing fee has not been paid (pcs)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid and No IFP Motion Filed. Filer is instructed to file an IFP Motion or a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (pcs)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Maria Velez Zamora. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Commissioner of SSA, #2 Summon(s) Attorney General of USA, #3 Summon(s) US Atty SD of FL)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Segarra, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamora v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Velez Zamora
Represented By: Luis Alberto Segarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?