LOCH v. CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LOCH
Defendant: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv23369
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 12/14/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL LOCH. CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC. waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Black, Stefanie)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that on or before November 11, 2020, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.. (jao)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13346049, filed by MICHAEL LOCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Black, Stefanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOCH v. CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LOCH
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Represented By: Stefanie Alicia Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELEBRITY CRUISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?